+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On September 7, 2004 in the House:
- 3:45 PM 6/25/04 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- PERMANENTLY FILED 6/28 LEGIS RESOLVE 65
On May 10, 2004 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/10/2004
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- PASSED Y20 N-
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: HCR 29 AM
On April 22, 2004 in the Senate:
- JUD RPT 4DP
- DP: SEEKINS, ELLIS, FRENCH, OGAN
- FN1: ZERO(CRT)
On April 7, 2004 in the Senate:
- STA RPT 3NR
- NR: STEVENS G, COWDERY, STEDMAN
- FN1: ZERO(CRT)
On March 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA, JUD
On March 22, 2004 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/22/2004
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- AM NO 1 OFFERED
- AM TO AM 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 AS AM ADOPTED Y25 N14 E1
- PASSED Y39 E1
- COSPONSOR(S): GRUENBERG, ROKEBERG,
- SEATON, LYNN
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: HCR 29 AM
On March 3, 2004 in the House:
- JUD RPT 6DP 1NR
- DP: GARA, HOLM, GRUENBERG, OGG,
- ANDERSON, MCGUIRE; NR: SAMUELS
- FN1: ZERO(CRT)
On February 16, 2004 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- JUD