+ − Summary
+ − Actions (20)
On May 7, 1996 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CAL 3 1NR 1 OTHER 5/7/96
- NOT TAKEN UP
On April 12, 1996 in the Senate:
- TRA RPT 3DP 1NR
- PREVIOUS H ZERO FN (DOT)
On March 22, 1996 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- TRANSPORTATION
On March 21, 1996 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/21/96
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- TRA CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED Y35 E2 A3
- COSPONSOR(S): KUBINA
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On March 19, 1996 in the House:
- STA REFERRAL WAIVED
On March 11, 1996 in the House:
- TRA RPT CS(TRA) 3DP 3NR
- DP: WILLIAMS, JAMES, G.DAVIS
- NR: MASEK, LONG, BRICE
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DOT)
On February 12, 1996 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- TRANSPORTATION, STATE AFFAIRS
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor