+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (34)
On May 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- CRA RPT 4DP 1NR
- DP: STEDMAN, WAGONER, STEVENS G, ELTON;
- NR: LINCOLN
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
- FN3: ZERO(UA)
- REFERRED TO RESOURCES
On April 29, 2004 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- CRA, RES
On April 28, 2004 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/28/04
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED Y36 E2 A2
- COSPONSOR(S): LYNN
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHCR 28(FIN) AM
On April 22, 2004 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 7DP
- DP: MEYER, HAWKER, MOSES, CHENAULT,
- FATE, FOSTER, WILLIAMS
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
- FN3: ZERO(UA)
On March 4, 2004 in the House:
- RES RPT 5DP 1DNP 2NR
- DP: GATTO, STEPOVICH, HEINZE,
- GUTTENBERG, DAHLSTROM; DNP: WOLF;
- NR: LYNN, MASEK
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
- FN2: (UA)
On February 23, 2004 in the House:
- EDT RPT 4DP
- DP: MCGUIRE, CISSNA, CRAWFORD, HEINZE
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
- FN2: (UA)
- FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER RES
On January 28, 2004 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- EDT, RES
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (2)
SEATON BY REQUEST OF SALMON INDUSTRY TASK FORCE
Type:
Primary Sponsor