+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (34)
On April 25, 1994 in the House:
- READ BY GOVERNOR 4/22 LEGIS RESOLVE 36
On April 20, 1994 in the House:
- CLERICAL CORRECTION
- 2:23 PM 4/20/94 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 18, 1994 in the Senate:
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOVERNOR NEXT
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y15 N4 E1
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN SECOND READING
On April 15, 1994 in the Senate:
- DUNCAN NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- PASSED Y18 N1 E1 HCR 28
- PEARCE, RIEGER, FRANK, MILLER
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): PHILLIPS, LITTLE,
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/15/94
On March 15, 1994 in the Senate:
- PREVIOUS H ZERO FN (LAA)
- JUD RPT 4DP 1NR
On March 3, 1994 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): LEMAN
On March 2, 1994 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- JUDICIARY
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): HALFORD, TAYLOR, SHARP
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): DONLEY
On February 28, 1994 in the House:
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y29 N3 E8
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN SECOND READING
On February 24, 1994 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/24/94
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- PASSED Y31 N3 E4 A2
- BROWN NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- COSPONSOR(S): THERRIAULT
On February 23, 1994 in the House:
- -ZERO FISCAL NOTE (H.JUD) 2/23/94
- NR: KOTT, GREEN, JAMES, NORDLUND
- DP: PORTER, PHILLIPS
- JUD RPT 2DP 4NR
On January 26, 1994 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): HANLEY
On January 19, 1994 in the House:
- JUDICIARY
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsors (31)
Type:
Primary Sponsor