+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On October 21, 1996 in the House:
- READ BY GOVERNOR 5/09 LEGIS RESOLVE 56
On May 6, 1996 in the House:
- 11:35 PM 5/06/96 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 29, 1996 in the Senate:
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOVERNOR NEXT
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y19 N- A1
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
On April 28, 1996 in the Senate:
- HOFFMAN NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- PASSED Y19 N1
- READ THE SECOND TIME HCR 27 AM
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/28/96
On April 24, 1996 in the Senate:
- PREVIOUS H ZERO FN (LAA)
- HES RPT 3DP 1NR
On March 12, 1996 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- HES
On March 11, 1996 in the House:
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- PASSED Y38 E2
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/11/96
On February 21, 1996 in the House:
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (LAA)
- NR: G.DAVIS
- DP: BRICE
- DP: ROKEBERG, BUNDE, TOOHEY, ROBINSON
- HES RPT 5DP 1NR
On February 12, 1996 in the House:
- HEALTH, EDUCATION AND SOCIAL SERVICES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor