+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 19, 2004 in the Senate:
- STA REFERRAL WAIVED
- REFERRED TO RESOURCES
On April 7, 2004 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA, RES
On April 6, 2004 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/6/2004
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RES CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED Y35 E1 A4
- COSPONSOR(S): LYNN
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHCR 27(RES)
On April 1, 2004 in the House:
- RES RPT CS(RES) 5DP 3AM
- DP: LYNN, STEPOVICH, WOLF, MASEK,
- DAHLSTROM; AM: GATTO, GUTTENBERG,
- KERTTULA
- FN1: ZERO(H.RES)
On January 20, 2004 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- RES
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor