+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 31, 2004 in the Senate:
- STA RPT 4DP
- DP: STEVENS G, COWDERY, STEDMAN, GUESS
- FN1: ZERO(DFG)
- FN2: ZERO(CED)
- REFERRED TO RESOURCES
On March 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA, RES
On March 22, 2004 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/22/2004
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RES CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED Y39 E1
- COSPONSOR(S): CHENAULT, GARA, LYNN,
- SEATON, DAHLSTROM
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHCR 25(RES)
On February 12, 2004 in the House:
- RES RPT CS(RES) 7DP
- DP: LYNN, STEPOVICH, KERTTULA,
- GUTTENBERG, GATTO, MASEK, DAHLSTROM
- FN1: ZERO(DFG)
On February 4, 2004 in the House:
- FSH RPT 5DP 1AM
- DP: GARA, OGG, WILSON, SAMUELS,
- SEATON; AM: GUTTENBERG
- FN1: ZERO(DFG)
On January 28, 2004 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): WILSON
On January 20, 2004 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- FSH, RES