+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On June 23, 2011 in the House:
- FEDERAL LIAISON: REAR ADMIRAL OSTEBO, USC
On August 27, 2010 in the House:
- EXECUTIVE BRANCH: LARRY HARTIG, CORA CAMPBELL (ALTERNATE)
- CHUCK GREENE, DAVE KUBIAK
- PUBLIC: EDWARD ITTA, CHRIS HLADICK, DENISE MICHELS,
- MEMBERS: HERRON, JOULE, EDGMON (ALTERNATE)
On August 27, 2010 in the Senate:
- MEMBERS: HOFFMAN, STEDMAN, OLSON (ALTERNATE)
On August 27, 2010 in the House:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 8/3 LEGIS RESOLVE 54
- FEDERAL: APPOINTMENT PENDING
On July 9, 2010 in the House:
- 11:27 AM 6/11/10 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 17, 2010 in the Senate:
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/17/2010
- VERSION: CSHCR 22(FIN)
- BEFORE THE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE
- PASSED Y19 N- A1
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
On April 16, 2010 in the Senate:
- FN2: (LEG)
- DP: HOFFMAN, STEDMAN, HUGGINS, THOMAS, EGAN, OLSON, ELLIS
- FIN RPT 7DP
On April 11, 2010 in the Senate:
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 10, 2010 in the House:
- VERSION: CSHCR 22(FIN)
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- PASSED Y40
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/10/2010
On April 9, 2010 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) 8DP 2NR
- NR: STOLTZE, HAWKER
- DP: THOMAS, GARA, DOOGAN, JOULE, AUSTERMAN, N.FOSTER, KELLY, SALMON
- FN2: (LEG)
On March 31, 2010 in the House:
- FN1: (LEG)
- NR: KELLER
- DP: HARRIS, CISSNA, GARDNER, MUNOZ, HERRON
- CRA RPT CS(CRA) 5DP 1NR
On March 24, 2010 in the House:
- CRA, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsor
COMMUNITY & REGIONAL AFFAIRS
Type:
Primary Sponsor