+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (46)
On May 5, 2004 in the House:
- REPORT FILED
On April 22, 2004 in the House:
- REPORT RECEIVED
On January 12, 2004 in the Senate:
- KOHLER
On August 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- PUBLIC MEMBERS APPOINTED BY SENATE:
On August 20, 2003 in the House:
- CARLSON, BOUCHER
- PUBLIC MEMBERS APPOINTED BY HOUSE:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 6/5 LEGIS RESOLVE 24
- 11:31 AM 6/4/03 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On August 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- WILKINSON, HAAGENSON,
On May 21, 2003 in the House:
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y35 E2 A3
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On May 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- FIN SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/20/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- PASSED Y18 N1 A1
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): ELLIS, DYSON, TAYLOR,
- ELTON, WILKEN, OLSON
- VERSION: SCS CSHCR 21(FIN)
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
On May 17, 2003 in the Senate:
- FN1: (LEG)
- NR: OLSON
- DP: GREEN, TAYLOR, STEVENS B, BUNDE;
- FIN RPT SCS 4DP 1NR SAME TITLE
On May 14, 2003 in the Senate:
- L&C RPT 5NR
- FN1: (LEG)
- SEEKINS, STEVENS G
- NR: BUNDE, DAVIS, FRENCH,
On May 11, 2003 in the Senate:
- L&C, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On May 10, 2003 in the House:
- PASSED Y34 E5 A1
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/10/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- COSPONSOR(S): LYNN, CISSNA, WILSON,
- DAHLSTROM, GUTTENBERG, CRAWFORD, GARA,
- BERKOWITZ
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHCR 21(FIN)
On May 9, 2003 in the House:
- FN1: (LEG)
- MOSES, HARRIS, WILLIAMS
- DP: HAWKER, STOLTZE, FOSTER, CHENAULT,
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) 7DP
On May 8, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): CHENAULT, FOSTER, MORGAN
On May 7, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MASEK
On May 5, 2003 in the House:
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor