+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (42)
On May 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): COSTELLO
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): MICCICHE, BISHOP, GIESSEL, VON IMHOF
On April 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): BEGICH, WIELECHOWSKI, GARDNER
On April 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): MEYER
On April 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- HSS
- REFERRED TO HEALTH & SOCIAL SERVICES
On April 6, 2018 in the House:
- MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- STA CS ADOPTED UC
- PASSED Y28 N8 E4
- COSPONSOR(S): ZULKOSKY, KAWASAKI, JOSEPHSON
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHCR 2(STA)
On April 5, 2018 in the House:
- HELD TO 4/6 CALENDAR
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- HELD TO 4/5 CALENDAR
On April 2, 2018 in the House:
- NOT TAKEN UP 4/2 - ON 4/4 CALENDAR
On March 30, 2018 in the House:
- NOT TAKEN UP 3/30 - ON 4/2 CALENDAR
On March 29, 2018 in the House:
- NOT TAKEN UP 3/29 - ON 3/30 CALENDAR
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- TECHNICAL SESSION 3/28 - ON 3/29 CALENDAR
On March 27, 2018 in the House:
- NOT TAKEN UP 3/27 - ON 3/28 CALENDAR
On March 26, 2018 in the House:
- NOT TAKEN UP 3/26 - ON 3/27 CALENDAR
On March 23, 2018 in the House:
- NOT TAKEN UP 3/23 - ON 3/26 CALENDAR
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- NOT TAKEN UP 3/22 - ON 3/23 CALENDAR
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- NOT TAKEN UP 3/21 - ON 3/22 CALENDAR
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- NOT TAKEN UP 3/20 - ON 3/21 CALENDAR
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/19/2018
- HELD TO 3/20 CALENDAR
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): LEDOUX
On February 16, 2018 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MILLETT
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): SEATON
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- STA RPT CS(STA) NT 3DP 4NR
- DP: TUCK, WOOL, KREISS-TOMKINS
- NR: BIRCH, KNOPP, LEDOUX, JOHNSON
- FN2: ZERO(LEG)
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- HSS RPT 6DP 1NR
- DP: JOHNSTON, TARR, EDGMON, SULLIVAN-LEONARD, KITO, SPOHNHOLZ
- NR: EASTMAN
- FN1: ZERO(H.HSS)
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): ORTIZ
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- HSS, STA
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor