+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (37)
On June 24, 2013 in the House:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 6/2 LEGIS RESOLVE 4
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- 9:55 AM 4/5/13 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- VERSION: HCR 2
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- PASSED Y20 N-
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): FRENCH, OLSON
- BEFORE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/21/2013
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- STA RPT 3DP
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
- DP: DYSON, WIELECHOWSKI, COGHILL
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- STEVENS, DUNLEAVY
- BISHOP, GARDNER, EGAN, GIESSEL, FAIRCLOUGH, STEDMAN, MEYER, HOFFMAN, ELLIS,
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): MICCICHE, WIELECHOWSKI, DYSON, KELLY, COGHILL, MCGUIRE,
- STA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- PASSED Y33 E7
- BEFORE HOUSE IN SECOND READING
- VERSION: HCR 2
- COSPONSOR(S): COSTELLO, CHENAULT, HERRON, JOSEPHSON, KELLER, THOMPSON, PRUITT,
- SADDLER
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MILLETT, STOLTZE, JOHNSON, TUCK, DRUMMOND, KERTTULA, MUNOZ
- HELD IN SECOND READING TO 3/11 CALENDAR
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/5/2013
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
- DP: SADDLER, GRUENBERG, HIGGINS, HUGHES, REINBOLD, LEDOUX
- MLV RPT 6DP
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): REINBOLD
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): TARR
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): LEDOUX
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KREISS-TOMKINS
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- MLV
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (40)
Type:
Primary Sponsor