+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (36)
On October 24, 2015 in the House:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 9/1 LEGIS RESOLVE 5
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- 3:27 PM 3/27/15 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On March 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- BEFORE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y4 N13 E3
- PASSED Y17 N- E3
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): STOLTZE, BISHOP, MEYER
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: CSHCR 2(EDC)
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/18/2015
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- HELD TO 3/20 CALENDAR UC
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): DUNLEAVY, MCGUIRE, COGHILL, GIESSEL, MACKINNON, MICCICHE
- KELLY
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- EDC RPT 3DP 1NR 1AM
- DP: DUNLEAVY, GIESSEL, HUGGINS
- NR: STEVENS
- AM: GARDNER
- FN1: ZERO(H.EDC)
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- EDC
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/23/2015
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- EDC CS ADOPTED UC
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y14 N23 E3
- AM NO 2 FAILED Y14 N21 E4 A1
- PASSED Y21 N14 E4 A1
- COSPONSOR(S): JOHNSON, NEUMAN, TILTON
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHCR 2(EDC)
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): HUGHES, LYNN
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- EDC RPT CS(EDC) NT 4DP
- DP: KREISS-TOMKINS, DRUMMOND, SEATON, KELLER
- FN1: ZERO(H.EDC)
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): VAZQUEZ
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- EDC
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor