+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On September 19, 2014 in the House:
- 2:52 PM 7/1/14 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- PERMANENTLY FILED 7/17 LEGIS RESOLVE 45
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/15/2014
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- BEFORE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE
- PASSED Y20 N-
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: CSHCR 19(HSS)
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- HSS RPT 3DP
- DP: STEDMAN, MICCICHE, ELLIS
- FN1: ZERO(H.HSS)
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- HSS
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/1/2014
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- HSS CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED Y37 E3
- COSPONSOR(S): TARR, KELLER, JOSEPHSON, PRUITT, ISAACSON
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHCR 19(HSS)
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- HSS RPT CS(HSS) NT 6DP
- DP: REINBOLD, PRUITT, KELLER, NAGEAK, TARR, HIGGINS
- FN1: ZERO(H.HSS)
- COSPONSOR(S): HUGHES
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- HSS
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor