+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (54)
On November 7, 2018 in the House:
- 11:56 AM 8/14/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- PERMANENTLY FILED 10/5 LEGIS RESOLVE 35
On April 28, 2018 in the House:
- CONCUR MESSAGE TAKEN UP
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y34 N2 E4
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND HELD
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- RLS RPT SCS 1DP 3NR 1AM NEW TITLE
- NR: MEYER, MACKINNON, KELLY
- DP: MICCICHE
- AM: GARDNER
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/25/2018
- BEFORE THE SENATE IN SECOND READING
- RLS SCS ADOPTED UC
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UC
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
- BEFORE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE
- PASSED Y20 N-
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): HOFFMAN, MICCICHE, STEVENS, MACKINNON, STEDMAN, BISHOP
- COSTELLO, VON IMHOF, GARDNER, EGAN, OLSON, WIELECHOWSKI, BEGICH, MEYER
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SCS CSHCR 19(RLS) AM S
On April 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RETURNED TO RLS COMMITTEE UC
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/23/2018
- NOT TAKEN UP 4/23 - ON 4/24 CALENDAR
On April 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- STA RPT SCS 5DP NEW TITLE
- DP: MEYER, WILSON, GIESSEL, EGAN, COGHILL
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
On April 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- CRA RPT 3DP
- DP: BISHOP, GARDNER, HOFFMAN
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- CRA, STA
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- CRA CS ADOPTED UC
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UC
- PASSED Y34 N4 E2
- COSPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI, SPOHNHOLZ, JOSEPHSON, DRUMMOND, TUCK, SULLIVAN-LEONARD
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHCR 19(CRA) AM
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- HELD TO 3/19 CALENDAR
- COSPONSOR(S): ZULKOSKY, GARA
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/14/2018
- HELD TO 3/15 CALENDAR
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GRENN
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- CRA RPT CS(CRA) 5DP
- DP: SADDLER, DRUMMOND, LINCOLN, RAUSCHER, PARISH
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MILLETT
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): TARR
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): CHENAULT
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): PARISH, EDGMON, FOSTER, KOPP, LINCOLN
On February 16, 2018 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- CRA
+ − Amendment
AM 1
AM NO 1 OFFERED
+ − Sponsors (33)
Type:
Primary Sponsor