+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (29)
On September 19, 2014 in the House:
- 2:52 PM 7/1/14 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- PERMANENTLY FILED 7/28 LEGIS RESOLVE 44
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/14/2014
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- BEFORE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE
- PASSED Y20 N-
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: HCR 18
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- HSS RPT 3DP
- DP: STEDMAN, MICCICHE, KELLY
- FN1: ZERO(H.HSS)
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- HSS
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): GARDNER, MCGUIRE
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): MICCICHE
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/24/2014
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- PASSED Y35 E5
- COSPONSOR(S): JOHNSON, SEATON
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: HCR 18
On March 21, 2014 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): LYNN
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- HSS RPT 5DP 1NR
- DP: REINBOLD, KELLER, NAGEAK, TARR, HIGGINS
- NR: PRUITT
- FN1: ZERO(H.HSS)
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): DRUMMOND
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- HSS
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor