+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (42)
On September 19, 2014 in the House:
- LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 5/14/14
- FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 266
- FN2: (LEG)
- 2:52 PM 7/1/14 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- PERMANENTLY FILED 7/28 LEGIS RESOLVE 60
- PUBLIC MEMBERS REPRESENTING:
- JOHN PARKER, KENAI, INDUSTRY
- BOB MAY, KASILOF, PUBLIC
On September 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 5/14/14
On September 19, 2014 in the House:
- STEVE WACKOWSKI, ANCHORAGE, INDUSTRY
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/17/2014
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- BEFORE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE
- PASSED Y19 N- A1
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: CSHCR 15(FIN)
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT 4DP 2NR
- DP: BISHOP, HOFFMAN, OLSON, FAIRCLOUGH
- NR: KELLY, DUNLEAVY
- FN2: (LEG)
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- FIN
On April 4, 2014 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/4/2014
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED Y36 E3 A1
- COSPONSOR(S): ISAACSON
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHCR 15(FIN)
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 11DP
- DP: GUTTENBERG, HOLMES, NEUMAN, MUNOZ, THOMPSON, EDGMON, T.WILSON, GARA,
- COSTELLO, STOLTZE, AUSTERMAN
- FN2: (LEG)
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): THOMPSON
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- L&C RPT CS(L&C) NT 5DP 2NR
- DP: MILLETT, REINBOLD, SADDLER, JOSEPHSON, OLSON
- NR: CHENAULT, HERRON
- FN1: (LEG)
- FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER L&C
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- L&C