+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- RLS
- REFERRED TO RULES
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- BEFORE HOUSE ON FINAL PASSAGE
- PASSED Y24 N15 E1
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: HCR 13 AM
On February 28, 2020 in the House:
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- AM NO 1 NOT OFFERED
- AM NO 2 FAILED Y7 N23 E5 A5
- AM NO 3 OFFERED
- AM 1 TO AM 3 OFFERED AND PENDING
- AM 1 TO AM 3 ADOPTED Y20 N8 E12
- AM 2 TO AM 3 ADOPTED Y25 N3 E12
- AM NO 3 AS AM ADOPTED Y26 N2 E12
- AM NO 4 NOT OFFERED
- AM NO 5 FAILED Y7 N21 E12
- AM NO 6 FAILED Y9 N19 E12
- HELD IN SECOND READING TO 3/2 CALENDAR
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/26/2020
- HELD TO 2/28 CALENDAR
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- RLS
+ − Amendments (8)
AM 1
AM NO 1 NOT OFFERED
AM 1 to AM 3
AM NO 3 AS AM ADOPTED Y26 N2 E12
AM 2
AM NO 2 FAILED Y7 N23 E5 A5
AM 2 to AM 3
AM 2 TO AM 3 ADOPTED Y25 N3 E12
AM 3
AM NO 3 OFFERED
AM 4
AM NO 4 NOT OFFERED
AM 5
AM NO 5 FAILED Y7 N21 E12
AM 6
AM NO 6 FAILED Y9 N19 E12
+ − Sponsor
HOUSE RULES
Type:
Primary Sponsor