+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (26)
On March 8, 1995 in the House:
- READ BY GOVERNOR 3/06 LEGIS RESOLVE 8
On March 6, 1995 in the House:
- 4:20 PM 3/03/95 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On March 3, 1995 in the Senate:
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- PASSED Y16 N- E3 A1
- ZHAROFF, SALO
- GREEN, TAYLOR, HALFORD, RIEGER, MILLER,
- ADAMS, PEARCE, SHARP, KELLY, LEMAN,
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): DUNCAN, LINCOLN,
- READ THE SECOND TIME HCR 11
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/3/95
- PREVIOUS H ZERO FNS (DHSS, LAW)
- STA RPT 5DP
On March 2, 1995 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- STATE AFFAIRS
On March 1, 1995 in the House:
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- COSPONSOR(S): TOOHEY, JAMES
- PASSED Y39 E1
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/01/95
- 2 ZERO FISCAL NOTES (LAW, DHSS)
- DP: WILLIS
- DP: JAMES, PORTER, GREEN, ROBINSON
- STA RPT 5DP
On February 22, 1995 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): ELTON
On February 15, 1995 in the House:
- STATE AFFAIRS
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor