+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (43)
On May 10, 2003 in the House:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 5/8 LEGIS RESOLVE 15
On May 7, 2003 in the House:
- 9:30 AM 5/7/03 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
On May 1, 2003 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/1/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): LINCOLN, DYSON,
- STEVENS G, WAGONER, ELTON, ELLIS,
- TAYLOR, STEVENS B, COWDERY, BUNDE,
- WILKEN, OLSON
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: CSHCR 11(FSH) AM
On April 25, 2003 in the Senate:
- STA RPT 3DP
- DP: STEVENS G, DYSON, GUESS
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
On April 7, 2003 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA
On April 4, 2003 in the House:
- RES RPT CS(FSH) NT 8DP
- DP: GUTTENBERG, WOLF, MASEK, LYNN,
- GATTO, MORGAN, HEINZE, FATE
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/4/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FSH CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN
- NEW AM NO 1 OFFERED
- AM TO AM 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 AS AM ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
- PASSED Y37 E2 A1
- COSPONSOR(S): DAHLSTROM, WILSON
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHCR 11(FSH) AM
On April 2, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): OGG, HARRIS
On March 28, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MCGUIRE
On March 26, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): HEINZE, CHENAULT
On March 24, 2003 in the House:
- FSH RPT CS(FSH) NT 4DP
- DP: BERKOWITZ, WILSON, SAMUELS, SEATON
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
On March 19, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): LYNN, FATE, SAMUELS
On March 17, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): FOSTER, COGHILL, MEYER
On February 28, 2003 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- FSH, RES
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor