+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (25)
On May 9, 2003 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- RES
- REFERRED TO RESOURCES
On May 8, 2003 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/8/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- PASSED Y35 E4 A1
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: HCR 10
On May 6, 2003 in the House:
- RES RPT 6DP 1NR
- DP: LYNN, GATTO, MORGAN, MASEK,
- HEINZE, FATE; NR: WOLF
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
- COSPONSOR(S): GRUENBERG
On April 17, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GATTO
On April 7, 2003 in the House:
- FSH RPT 4DP 1NR
- DP: OGG, WILSON, SAMUELS, SEATON;
- NR: GUTTENBERG
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
On April 4, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): WILSON
On April 2, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MORGAN
On March 26, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): HEINZE, CHENAULT
On March 19, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): LYNN, MEYER
On March 17, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): FOSTER
On February 28, 2003 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- FSH, RES
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor