+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (41)
On July 20, 2001 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/1/01
- 3:10 PM 6/20/01 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/25 CHAPTER 50 SLA 01
On May 1, 2001 in the Senate:
- VERSION: CSHB 99(HES)
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y19 N1
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 99(HES)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3OR 5/1/01
On April 23, 2001 in the Senate:
- HES RPT 3DP
- FN2: ZERO(EED)
- DP: LEMAN, WARD, DAVIS
On April 12, 2001 in the Senate:
- HES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 12, 2001 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): STEVENS
On April 11, 2001 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/11/01
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- HES CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 99(HES)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- COSPONSOR(S): FATE, GUESS, GREEN,
- PASSED Y35 E5
- MEYER, HUDSON, MURKOWSKI, ROKEBERG
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 99(HES)
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
On April 10, 2001 in the House:
- DP: BUNDE, WHITAKER, HARRIS, CROFT,
- FIN RPT CS(HES) 9DP
- DAVIES, MOSES, LANCASTER, HUDSON,
- WILLIAMS
- FN2: ZERO(EED)
On April 4, 2001 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(H.HES/EED)
- STEVENS, DYSON; NR: JOULE
- DP: COGHILL, KOHRING, WILSON, CISSNA,
- HES RPT CS(HES) 6DP 1NR
On March 20, 2001 in the House:
- EDU REFERRAL WAIVED
On March 7, 2001 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): DYSON
On January 31, 2001 in the House:
- EDU, HES, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor