+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (40)
On October 5, 2022 in the House:
- FN2: (CED)
- FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 281
- LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 8/10/22
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 11/30/22
- LAW W/O GOV SIGNATURE 9/1 CHAPTER 66 SLA 22
- 9:40 A.M. 8/9/22 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/16/2022
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 99
- PASSED Y19 N- A1
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: HB 99
On May 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- FN2: (CED)
- NR: WILSON
- DP: STEDMAN, HOFFMAN, OLSON, VON IMHOF
- FIN RPT 4DP 1NR
On January 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- FN2: (CED)
- DP: COSTELLO, MICCICHE, REVAK, GRAY-JACKSON, STEVENS
- L&C RPT 5DP
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- L&C, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On May 18, 2021 in the House:
- VERSION: HB 99
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- PASSED Y38 N2
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 99
On May 17, 2021 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/18 CALENDAR
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/17/2021
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- FIN RPT 6DP 2NR
- NR: WOOL, JOSEPHSON
- DP: ORTIZ, EDGMON, LEBON, THOMPSON, MERRICK, FOSTER
- FN1: (CED)
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- FN1: (CED)
- DP: SNYDER, NELSON, MCCARTY, SCHRAGE, KAUFMAN, SPOHNHOLZ
- L&C RPT 6DP
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER L&C
- HSS REFERRAL REMOVED
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- HSS, L&C
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor