+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (40)
On April 8, 2004 in the House:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 4/7 CHAPTER 13 SLA 04
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/6/04
On March 22, 2004 in the House:
- 10:58AM 3/22/04 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On March 17, 2004 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/17/2004
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 98
- PASSED Y17 N1 E2
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: HB 98
On February 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- RES RPT 3DP 2NR
- DP: OGAN, WAGONER, DYSON;
- NR: SEEKINS, ELTON
- FN3: ZERO(DFG)
- FN4: ZERO(DPS)
On February 2, 2004 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MORGAN
On April 15, 2003 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- RES
On April 14, 2003 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/14/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 98
- PASSED Y36 E4
- COSPONSOR(S): DAHLSTROM, KERTTULA,
- MEYER, KOOKESH, LYNN, OGG
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: HB 98
On April 10, 2003 in the House:
- RES RPT 8DP
- DP: LYNN, GATTO, MORGAN, MASEK, WOLF,
- KERTTULA, GUTTENBERG, FATE
- FN1: ZERO(DFG)
- FN2: ZERO(DPS)
On April 9, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): WOLF
On March 28, 2003 in the House:
- FSH RPT 6DP
- DP: OGG, HEINZE, WILSON, SAMUELS,
- GUTTENBERG, SEATON
- FN1: ZERO(DFG)
- FN2: ZERO(DPS)
On February 14, 2003 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- FSH, RES
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor