+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (40)
On May 2, 2011 in the House:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 4/28 CHAPTER 5 SLA 11
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/27/11
On April 14, 2011 in the House:
- 12:20 PM 4/14/11 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On March 25, 2011 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y34 E6
- COSPONSOR(S): PRUITT
On March 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/23/2011
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- STA SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS HB 98(STA)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): DAVIS, OLSON, PASKVAN
- PASSED Y20 N-
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SCS HB 98(STA)
On March 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- STA RPT SCS 4DP SAME TITLE
- DP: WIELECHOWSKI, PASKVAN, MEYER, GIESSEL
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- FN2: ZERO(MVA)
On February 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): MCGUIRE, GIESSEL, MEYER, MENARD, ELLIS, WAGONER, EGAN, DYSON,
- STEVENS
On February 28, 2011 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): JOHANSEN
On February 25, 2011 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/25/2011
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 98
- PASSED Y35 E4 A1
- COSPONSOR(S): COSTELLO, CHENAULT, OLSON, MILLETT, FAIRCLOUGH, KERTTULA, FEIGE,
- THOMAS, P.WILSON, KAWASAKI
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: HB 98
On February 18, 2011 in the House:
- STA RPT 5DP
- DP: JOHANSEN, KELLER, SEATON, PETERSEN, LYNN
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- FN2: ZERO(MVA)
- COSPONSOR(S): KELLER
On January 18, 2011 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor