+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On May 15, 1999 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT SCS 2DP 4NR SAME TITLE
- DP: TORGERSON, ADAMS; NR: PARNELL,
- WILKEN, LEMAN, PHILLIPS
- HOUSE ZERO FISCAL NOTE (REV)
- REFERRED TO RULES
On May 13, 1999 in the Senate:
- RES REFERRAL WAIVED
On April 23, 1999 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- RES, FIN
On April 22, 1999 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSSHB 96(FIN)
- PASSED Y24 N11 E1 A4
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) UNAN CONSENT
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On April 21, 1999 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/21/99
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/22 CALENDAR
On April 14, 1999 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 5DP 5NR 1AM
- DP: MULDER, BUNDE, AUSTERMAN, DAVIS,
- WILLIAMS; NR: THERRIAULT, DAVIES,
- GRUSSENDORF, MOSES, FOSTER; AM: KOHRING
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (REV) 3/24/99
On March 24, 1999 in the House:
- STA RPT 3DP 1DNP 3NR
- DP: JAMES, HUDSON, WHITAKER; DNP: OGAN;
- NR: SMALLEY, KERTTULA, COGHILL
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (REV)
On March 15, 1999 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GREEN
On March 10, 1999 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): PHILLIPS
On March 5, 1999 in the House:
- SPONSOR SUBSTITUTE INTRODUCED
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- STA, FIN
On February 17, 1999 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- STA, FIN