+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (46)
On June 24, 2013 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/9/13
- FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 65
- LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 5/7/13
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/11 CHAPTER 46 SLA 13
- FN2: (DOT)
- FN3: (DOT)
- 11:45 AM 6/4/13 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y37 E2 A1
- CONSIDER CONCUR MESSAGE
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/11/2013
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS HB 94(FIN)
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SCS HB 94(FIN)
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- PASSED Y19 N- A1
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- FN3: (DOT)
- FN2: (DOT)
- DP: KELLY, MEYER, DUNLEAVY, FAIRCLOUGH, BISHOP, HOFFMAN
- TITLE CHANGE: SCR 8
- FIN RPT SCS 6DP NEW TITLE
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- TRA RPT 5DP
- FN1: (DOT)
- DP: EGAN, DYSON, FAIRCLOUGH, BISHOP, FRENCH
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- TRA, FIN
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 94
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/22/2013
- PASSED Y34 E4 A2
- COSPONSOR(S): KERTTULA, PRUITT
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: HB 94
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): COSTELLO, KAWASAKI, THOMPSON, T.WILSON
- FN1: (DOT)
- NEUMAN
- DP: KAWASAKI, HOLMES, MUNOZ, THOMPSON, EDGMON, GARA, T.WILSON, COSTELLO,
- FIN RPT 9DP
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- FN1: (DOT)
- DP: LYNN, JOHNSON, KREISS-TOMKINS, GATTIS, ISAACSON, P.WILSON
- TRA RPT 6DP
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- TRA, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS