+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (47)
On July 21, 1993 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 9/1/93
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/3 CHAPTER 48 SLA 93
- 02:45 PM 5/19/93 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 10, 1993 in the Senate:
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOVERNOR NEXT
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y20 N-
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
On May 10, 1993 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MACKIE
On May 9, 1993 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 93(CRA)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/9/93
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- PASSED Y20 N-
- DUNCAN NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): LINCOLN, JACKO, ADAMS,
- ZHAROFF, TAYLOR
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
On May 7, 1993 in the Senate:
- FIN REFERRAL WAIVED
- PREVIOUS H ZERO FN (DPS)
- JUD RPT 3DP
On April 24, 1993 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): ULMER
On April 21, 1993 in the Senate:
- JUDICIARY, FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On April 20, 1993 in the House:
- CRA CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/20/93
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 93(CRA)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED Y39 N- A1
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On April 16, 1993 in the House:
- -PREVIOUS ZERO FN (DPS) 3/26/93
- NR: THERRIAULT
- DP: GRUSSENDORF, BROWN, FOSTER
- DP: MACLEAN, LARSON, MARTIN, PARNELL
- FIN RPT CS(CRA) 7DP 1NR
On April 7, 1993 in the House:
- JUD RPT CS(CRA) 6DP 1NR
- DP: GREEN, PHILLIPS, JAMES, DAVIDSON
- DP: NORDLUND, PORTER
- NR: KOTT
- -PREVIOUS ZERO FN (DPS) 3/26/93
On March 26, 1993 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): HOFFMAN
- -ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DPS) 3/26/93
- DP: WILLIAMS, TOOHEY, OLBERG
- DP: SANDERS, BUNDE, DAVIES, WILLIS
- CRA RPT CS(CRA) 7DP
On February 19, 1993 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): NICHOLIA
On January 29, 1993 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MENARD
On January 27, 1993 in the House:
- CRA, JUDICIARY, FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor