+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 20, 2006 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): ELKINS
On April 12, 2006 in the House:
- REFERRED TO RULES
- FN2: (CED)
- NR: HAWKER, WEYHRAUCH, HOLM, JOULE, KERTTULA, STOLTZE, MOSES, MEYER, CHENAULT
- DP: FOSTER, KELLY;
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) 2DP 9NR
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) 2DP 2NR 2AM
- DP: WILSON, ANDERSON;
- NR: GARA, MCGUIRE;
- AM: COGHILL, GRUENBERG
- FN1: (CED)
On January 20, 2006 in the House:
- FN1: (CED)
- AM: CRAWFORD, GUTTENBERG
- NR: LYNN, KOTT, LEDOUX;
- DP: ANDERSON;
- L&C RPT CS(L&C) 1DP 3NR 2AM
On January 21, 2005 in the House:
- L&C, JUD, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor