+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (63)
On June 21, 2004 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/4/04
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/3 CHAPTER 34 SLA 04
- 11:01 AM 6/1/04 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 11, 2004 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y36 N3 A1
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On May 10, 2004 in the Senate:
- VERSION: SCS CSHB 93(TRA)
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
On May 9, 2004 in the Senate:
- ELLIS NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y17 N2 E1
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 93(TRA)
On May 8, 2004 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/8/2004
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- TRA SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/9 CALENDAR
On May 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- FN4: (ADM)
- FN3: ZERO(DNR)
- AM: GREEN; DP: HOFFMAN, DYSON
- NR: WILKEN, OLSON, BUNDE;
- FIN RPT SCS(TRA) 2DP 3NR 1AM
On May 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): DYSON
On April 21, 2004 in the Senate:
- FN4: (ADM)
- FN3: ZERO(DNR)
- DP: STEVENS G, COWDERY, STEDMAN
- STA RPT SCS(TRA) 3DP
On April 2, 2004 in the Senate:
- DP: WAGONER, COWDERY; NR: LINCOLN,
- TRA RPT SCS 2DP 3NR SAME TITLE
- THERRIAULT, OLSON
- FN4: (ADM)
- FN3: ZERO(DNR)
On February 6, 2004 in the Senate:
- TRA, STA, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On February 4, 2004 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/4/2004
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 93(FIN)
- PASSED Y37 N3
- COSPONSOR(S): CROFT, SEATON, KERTTULA
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 93(FIN)
On February 2, 2004 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 4DP 6NR
- DP: MEYER, FATE, FOSTER, WILLIAMS;
- CHENAULT, HARRIS
- NR: HAWKER, STOLTZE, JOULE, CROFT,
- FN3: ZERO(DNR)
- FN4: (ADM)
On April 9, 2003 in the House:
- FIN REFERRAL ADDED BEFORE RLS
- FN2: (ADM)
- FN1: ZERO(DNR)
- DAHLSTROM, WEYHRAUCH
- DP: SEATON, GRUENBERG, HOLM, LYNN,
- STA RPT CS(TRA) NT 6DP
On April 2, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): OGG
- FN1: ZERO(DNR)
- NR: OGG, FATE
- DP: HOLM; DNP: KOHRING, MASEK;
- TRA RPT CS(TRA) NT 1DP 2DNP 2NR
On February 12, 2003 in the House:
- TRA, STA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS