+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (26)
On May 16, 1999 in the Senate:
- REFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS
- HOUSE INDETERMINATE FISCAL NOTE (REV)
- DP: TIM KELLY, PHILLIPS; NR: HOFFMAN
- CRA RPT 2DP 1NR
- HOUSE ZERO FISCAL NOTES (REV, CRA)
On May 13, 1999 in the Senate:
- CRA, STA, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On May 13, 1999 in the House:
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- PASSED Y31 N6 E2 A1
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 92
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/13/99
On April 20, 1999 in the House:
- DP: MULDER, BUNDE, DAVIES, DAVIS;
- FIN RPT 4DP 2DNP 4NR
- 2 ZERO FISCAL NOTES (DCRA, REV) 3/5/99
- DNP: KOHRING, FOSTER; NR: THERRIAULT,
- AUSTERMAN, GRUSSENDORF, WILLIAMS
- INDETERMINATE FISCAL NOTE (REV) 3/5/99
On March 5, 1999 in the House:
- 2 ZERO FISCAL NOTES (DCRA, REV)
- INDETERMINATE FISCAL NOTE (REV)
- KOOKESH; NR: DYSON, HALCRO
- DP: JOULE, HARRIS, MURKOWSKI, MORGAN,
- CRA RPT 5DP 2NR
On February 10, 1999 in the House:
- CRA, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor