+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (39)
On February 2, 2004 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MORGAN
On April 29, 2003 in the Senate:
- HES, JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- REFERRED TO HEALTH, ED & SOCIAL SVCS
On April 28, 2003 in the House:
- VERSION: CSHB 92(JUD) AM
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
On April 25, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): DAHLSTROM
- GRUENBERG NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- PASSED Y32 N6 E2
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 92(JUD) AM
On April 24, 2003 in the House:
- AM NO 2 FAILED Y8 N29 E3
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/24/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULING OF THE CHAIR SUSTAINED
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y8 N29 E3
- JUD CS ADOPTED Y33 N5 E1 A1
- AM NO 3 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN
- NEW AM NO 3 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN
- AM NO 3 REOFFERED
- AM NO 3 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/25 CALENDAR
- COSPONSOR REMOVED: WILSON
On April 14, 2003 in the House:
- FN2: ZERO(LAW)
- FN1: ZERO(HSS)
- SAMUELS, HOLM, OGG, ANDERSON
- DP: GRUENBERG, MCGUIRE; NR: GARA,
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) NT 2DP 5NR
On April 9, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR REMOVED: HOLM
On March 26, 2003 in the House:
- FN2: ZERO(LAW)
- FN1: ZERO(HSS)
- AM: BERKOWITZ
- DAHLSTROM; NR: WEYHRAUCH;
- DP: GRUENBERG, SEATON, HOLM, LYNN,
- STA RPT CS(STA) NT 5DP 1NR 1AM
On March 24, 2003 in the House:
- JUD REPLACES HES REFERRAL
On February 19, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KERTTULA
On February 12, 2003 in the House:
- STA, HES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor