+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (47)
On May 10, 2004 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/10 PENDING REFERRAL
On May 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- L&C RPT SCS(STA) 1DNP 3NR
- DNP: BUNDE;
- NR: DAVIS, SEEKINS, STEVENS G
- FN2: (ADM)
- FN3: (ADM/VARIOUS DEPTS)
- REFERRED TO FINANCE
On April 7, 2004 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GATTO
On April 2, 2004 in the Senate:
- STA RPT SCS 3NR SAME TITLE
- NR: STEVENS G, COWDERY, STEDMAN
- FN3: (ADM/VARIOUS DEPTS)
On March 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA, L&C, FIN
On March 4, 2004 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/4/2004
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 91(FIN)
- PASSED Y33 N3 E2 A2
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 91(FIN)
On March 3, 2004 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): HAWKER
On February 26, 2004 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): HARRIS, WILSON,
- BERKOWITZ, KAPSNER
On February 23, 2004 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 3DP 7NR
- DP: CROFT, FATE, WILLIAMS; NR: MEYER,
- HAWKER, JOULE, MOSES, CHENAULT, FOSTER,
- HARRIS
- FN2: (ADM)
On February 18, 2004 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MEYER, STEPOVICH
On February 16, 2004 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): WEYHRAUCH
On February 12, 2004 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): OGG
On February 4, 2004 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): CROFT
On January 21, 2004 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KOTT, KERTTULA
On January 16, 2004 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): FATE
On January 14, 2004 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MCGUIRE
On January 12, 2004 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): HOLM
On March 12, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): HEINZE
On March 10, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): DAHLSTROM, LYNN
On March 7, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GRUENBERG
On February 24, 2003 in the House:
- L&C RPT 4DP 1NR
- DP: GATTO, CRAWFORD, GUTTENBERG,
- ANDERSON; NR: ROKEBERG
- FN1: INDETERMINATE(ADM)
- COSPONSOR(S): CRAWFORD, GUTTENBERG
On February 12, 2003 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- L&C, FIN
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor