+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (35)
On May 2, 1996 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR: RIEGER
On May 1, 1996 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- STA, RES, FINANCE
On April 30, 1996 in the House:
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
On April 29, 1996 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 91(RES)
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RES CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UNAN CONSENT
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- PASSED Y25 N13 E1 A1
- MULDER NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On April 27, 1996 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/29/96
On April 26, 1996 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(RES)NT 3DP 2DNP 3NR 2AM
- DP: GRUSSENDORF, BROWN, NAVARRE
- NR: FOSTER, PARNELL, KOHRING
- DNP: MULDER, KELLY
- FISCAL NOTE (DNR)
- AM: THERRIAULT, HANLEY
On May 5, 1995 in the House:
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DNR) 3/30/95
- AM: OGAN
- NR: KOTT, AUSTERMAN, GREEN
- DP: NICHOLIA, DAVIES, WILLIAMS
- RES RPT CS(RES) NT 3DP 3NR 1AM
On April 13, 1995 in the House:
- STA RPT 3DP 3NR
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DNR) 3/30/95
- DP: JAMES, WILLIS, ROBINSON
- NR: PORTER, GREEN, OGAN
On March 30, 1995 in the House:
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DNR)
- NR: MACLEAN, WILLIAMS, BRICE, G.DAVIS
- TRA RPT 4NR
On January 17, 1995 in the House:
- TRA, STA, RES, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor