+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On March 18, 2022 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KAUFMAN
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): SCHRAGE
On January 24, 2022 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): NELSON
On April 5, 2021 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KREISS-TOMKINS
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MCCARTY
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): PRAX
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): HOPKINS
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- REFERRED TO LABOR & COMMERCE
- L&C, RES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor