+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (43)
On September 10, 2013 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/27 CHAPTER 64 SLA 13
On June 24, 2013 in the House:
- 10:47 AM 6/21/13 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y19 N- A1
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 9
- VERSION: HB 9
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/11 CALENDAR
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/10/2013
On April 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- DP: COGHILL, MCGUIRE, DYSON
- JUD RPT 3DP 1NR
- FN1: ZERO(LAW)
- NR: WIELECHOWSKI
- FN2: ZERO(DNR)
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 9
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/25/2013
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y37 E3
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: HB 9
- COSPONSOR(S): TUCK, PRUITT, KREISS-TOMKINS, TARR
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): HOLMES
- FN2: ZERO(DNR)
- FN1: ZERO(LAW)
- NR: PRUITT, KELLER
- DP: GRUENBERG, FOSTER, LEDOUX, LYNN
- JUD RPT 4DP 2NR
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- DP: REINBOLD, JOSEPHSON, OLSON
- L&C RPT 3DP 3NR
- COSPONSOR(S): OLSON
- NR: CHENAULT, SADDLER, MILLETT
- FN1: ZERO(LAW)
- FN2: ZERO(DNR)
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KERTTULA
On January 16, 2013 in the House:
- L&C, JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/7/13