+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (77)
On August 20, 2003 in the House:
- 4:29 PM 6/16/03 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
- LAW W/O GOV SIGNATURE 7/9 CH 134 SLA 03
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
On May 21, 2003 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y29 N7 E2 A2
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y37 E2 A1
On May 21, 2003 in the Senate:
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y16 N4
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SCS CSHB 9(FIN)
On May 21, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): LYNN
On May 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 9(FIN)
- PASSED Y14 N6
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TAYLOR NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On May 19, 2003 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/19/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/20 CALENDAR
On May 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- FIN SCS RECEIVED SAME TITLE
On May 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT SCS FORTHCOMING 1DP 1DNP 4NR
- DP: WILKEN; NR: GREEN, HOFFMAN,
- OLSON, BUNDE; DNP: TAYLOR
- FN1: ZERO(REV)
- FN2: ZERO(LAW)
- FN3: ZERO(LWF)
- FN4: (CED)
On March 31, 2003 in the Senate:
- L&C RPT SCS 2DP 3NR SAME TITLE
- DP: BUNDE, SEEKINS;
- NR: DAVIS, FRENCH, STEVENS G
- FN1: ZERO(REV)
- FN2: ZERO(LAW)
- FN3: ZERO(LWF)
- FN4: (CED)
On March 3, 2003 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- L&C, FIN
On February 28, 2003 in the House:
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 9(FIN) AM
On February 26, 2003 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/26/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 9(FIN) AM
- PASSED Y24 N11 E1 A3 V1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADPD Y32 N5 E1 A1 V1
- STOLTZE NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On February 21, 2003 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 5DP 4NR
- DP: MEYER, HAWKER, WHITAKER, FOSTER,
- WILLIAMS; NR: STOLTZE, JOULE, CROFT,
- MOSES
- FN1: ZERO(REV)
- FN2: ZERO(LAW)
- FN3: ZERO(LWF)
- FN4: (CED)
On February 12, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): CRAWFORD
On February 7, 2003 in the House:
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) 4DP 2NR 1AM
- DP: HOLM, SAMUELS, ANDERSON, MCQUIRE;
- NR: GRUENBERG, COGHILL; AM: GARA
- FN1: ZERO(REV)
- FN2: ZERO(LAW)
- FN3: ZERO(LWF)
- FN4: (CED)
On January 31, 2003 in the House:
- L&C RPT CS(L&C) 6DP
- DP: LYNN, GATTO, CRAWFORD,
- GUTTENBERG, ROKEBERG, ANDERSON
- FN1: ZERO(REV)
- FN2: ZERO(LAW)
- FN3: ZERO(LWF)
- FN4: (CED)
- COSPONSOR(S): HAWKER
On January 21, 2003 in the House:
- PREFILE RELEASED (1/10/03)
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- L&C, JUD, FIN