+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On February 3, 2012 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): DICK
On April 4, 2011 in the House:
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) 4DP 2DNP 1NR
- DP: THOMPSON, KELLER, LYNN, GATTO
- DNP: HOLMES, GRUENBERG
- NR: PRUITT
- FN1: INDETERMINATE(LAW)
- REFERRED TO FINANCE
On March 25, 2011 in the House:
- STA RPT CS(STA) 3DP 2DNP 2NR
- DP: P.WILSON, KELLER, LYNN
- DNP: GRUENBERG, SEATON
- NR: JOHANSEN, PETERSEN
- FN1: INDETERMINATE(LAW)
- FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER JUD
On March 23, 2011 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KELLER
On March 10, 2011 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): LYNN
On January 18, 2011 in the House:
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/14/11
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA, JUD