+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (31)
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- REFERRED TO FINANCE
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- VERSION: CSHB 87(FIN)
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- COSPONSOR(S): TUCK, TARR
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y40
- RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UC
- STUTES NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y40
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 87(FIN)
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- CS(FIN) RECEIVED
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/13/2019
- FIN CS ADOPTED UC
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/14 CALENDAR
- COSPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON, WOOL
On May 11, 2019 in the House:
- FN2: INDETERMINATE(REV)
- NR: CARPENTER, TILTON, KNOPP, JOSEPHSON, ORTIZ, WILSON
- DP: JOHNSTON, LEBON, SULLIVAN-LEONARD, FOSTER
- (CS FORTHCOMING)
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) 4DP 6NR
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- FN1: INDETERMINATE(REV)
- NR: PRUITT
- DP: LINCOLN, ZULKOSKY, SPOHNHOLZ, FIELDS, RAUSCHER, HOPKINS
- ENE RPT 6DP 1NR
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): LEBON
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- ENE, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS