+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (39)
On August 24, 2011 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/20/11
- SIGNED INTO LAW 7/22 CHAPTER 27 SLA 11
- 10:23 AM 7/11/11 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- VERSION: CSHB 87(L&C)
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- PASSED Y20 N-
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 87(L&C)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/16/2011
On April 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- JUD REFERRAL WAIVED
On April 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- DP: EGAN, GIESSEL, DAVIS, PASKVAN, MENARD
- L&C RPT 5DP
- FN1: ZERO(LAW)
On April 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- L&C, JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 4, 2011 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/4/2011
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- L&C CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED Y36 E4
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 87(L&C)
- COSPONSOR(S): KERTTULA, PETERSEN, KAWASAKI, GUTTENBERG
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 87(L&C)
On March 31, 2011 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): P.WILSON
On March 29, 2011 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GARA
On March 25, 2011 in the House:
- JUD RPT CS(L&C) NT 3DP 3NR
- DP: HOLMES, THOMPSON, GRUENBERG
- NR: PRUITT, LYNN, GATTO
- FN1: ZERO(LAW)
- COSPONSOR(S): GRUENBERG
On March 9, 2011 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(LAW)
- NR: CHENAULT, JOHNSON
- DP: THOMPSON, HOLMES, MILLER, OLSON
- L&C RPT CS(L&C) NT 4DP 2NR
On January 18, 2011 in the House:
- L&C, JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/14/11
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor