+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (64)
On August 20, 2003 in the House:
- 3:15 PM 6/10/03 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/12 CHAPTER 81 SLA 03
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/10/03
On May 20, 2003 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
- CONCUR TAKEN UP
- RTN TO UNFIN. BUS. FLD Y12 N24 E3 A1
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y25 N11 E3 A1
- RESCIND CONCUR FAILED Y12 N24 E3 A1
On May 19, 2003 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSSSHB 86(JUD)
- PASSED Y12 N8
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) FAILED Y13 N7
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SCS CSSSHB 86(JUD)(EFD FLD S)
On May 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/18/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- JUD SCS ADOPTED Y12 N7 E1
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y6 N12 E1 A1
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/19 CALENDAR
On May 17, 2003 in the Senate:
- JUD RPT SCS 3DP 2DNP SAME TITLE
- DP: SEEKINS, THERRIAULT, OGAN;
- DNP: FRENCH, ELLIS
- FN1: ZERO(LAW)
On May 3, 2003 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- JUD
On May 2, 2003 in the House:
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 2 Y23 N11 E3 A3
- AM NO 2 OFFERED
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
- AM 1 TO AM 2 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM 2 TO AM 2 AS AM ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 2 AS AM ADOPTED Y23 N9 E3 A5
- AM NO 3(TITLE AM) FAILED Y15 N19 E3 A3
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y28 N6 E3 A3
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y31 N4 E3 A2
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSSSHB 86(JUD) AM
On May 1, 2003 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/1/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSSHB 86(JUD) AM
- PASSED Y36 E2 A2
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- MCGUIRE NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- COSPONSOR(S): MCGUIRE
On April 30, 2003 in the House:
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) NT 2DP 4NR
- DP: SAMUELS, MCGUIRE; NR: HOLM, GARA,
- OGG, GRUENBERG
- FN1: ZERO(LAW)
On April 9, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): HEINZE
On April 8, 2003 in the House:
- RES RPT 6DP 1DNP
- DP: WOLF, MASEK, MORGAN, GATTO, LYNN,
- FATE; DNP: KERTTULA
- FN1: ZERO(LAW)
On April 4, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): FOSTER, ROKEBERG, HOLM,
- KOTT, LYNN, CHENAULT, DAHLSTROM, WILSON
On April 2, 2003 in the House:
- SPONSOR SUBSTITUTE INTRODUCED
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- RES, JUD
On February 10, 2003 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- RES, JUD
+ − Amendments (7)
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor