+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (55)
On October 5, 2022 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
- 4:00 P.M. 6/17/22 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/29 CHAPTER 20 SLA 22
On May 5, 2022 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y33 E5 A2
- CONCUR TAKEN UP UC
On May 3, 2022 in the House:
- CONCUR READ AND HELD
On May 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- VERSION: SCS CSHB 85(L&C)
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 85(L&C)
On April 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/29/2022
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/2 CAL
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- L&C SCS ADOPTED UC
On April 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- FN7: ZERO(CED)
- FN6: ZERO(CED)
- FN5: ZERO(DEC)
- NR: WILSON, WIELECHOWSKI, OLSON
- DP: STEDMAN, BISHOP, HOFFMAN, VON IMHOF
- FIN RPT SCS(L&C) 4DP 3NR SAME TITLE
On January 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- NR: REVAK
- DP: COSTELLO, GRAY-JACKSON, STEVENS
- L&C RPT SCS(L&C) 3DP 1NR SAME TITLE
- FN5: ZERO(DEC)
- FN7: ZERO(CED)
- FN6: ZERO(CED)
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- L&C, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On May 14, 2021 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/14/2021
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- L&C CS ADOPTED UC
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 85(L&C)
- PASSED Y35 N2 E3
- COSPONSOR(S): THOMPSON, SCHRAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 85(L&C)
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- DP: ORTIZ, LEBON, THOMPSON, JOHNSON, RASMUSSEN, MERRICK
- FIN RPT CS(L&C) 6DP 4NR
- FN4: ZERO(DEC)
- NR: CARPENTER, WOOL, JOSEPHSON, FOSTER
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- FN2: ZERO(CED)
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MERRICK, RASMUSSEN
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- FN3: INDETERMINATE(DEC)
- FN2: ZERO(CED)
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- NR: KAUFMAN
- DP: SCHRAGE, MCCARTY, SNYDER, FIELDS, SPOHNHOLZ
- L&C RPT CS(L&C) 5DP 1NR
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- L&C, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (5)
LEBON BY REQUEST
Type:
Primary Sponsor