+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (55)
On September 7, 2004 in the House:
- 4:52 PM 7/16/04 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
- SIGNED INTO LAW 7/26 CHAPTER 170 SLA 04
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 1/1/05
On May 9, 2004 in the House:
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y35 E2 A3
- COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): MCGUIRE
On May 7, 2004 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On May 6, 2004 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/6/2004
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- JUD SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 83(JUD)
- PASSED Y18 N- A2
- COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- WILKEN NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y19 N- A1
- COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SCS CSHB 83(JUD)
On April 21, 2004 in the Senate:
- JUD RPT SCS 3DP 1NR SAME TITLE
- DP: SEEKINS, FRENCH, ELLIS;
- NR: OGAN
- FN4: ZERO(CRT)
On May 16, 2003 in the Senate:
- L&C RPT 3NR
- NR: BUNDE, SEEKINS, STEVENS G
- FN1: ZERO(LAW)
- FN2: ZERO(CRT)
- FN3: ZERO(COR)
On April 23, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GARA
On April 17, 2003 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- L&C, JUD
On April 16, 2003 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/16/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 83(JUD)
- PASSED Y31 N1 E3 A5
- COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 83(JUD)
On March 31, 2003 in the House:
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) 4DP 2NR
- DP: GARA, ANDERSON, GRUENBERG, MCGUIRE;
- NR: SAMUELS, COGHILL
- FN1: ZERO(LAW)
- FN2: ZERO(CRT)
- FN3: ZERO(COR)
On February 10, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MOSES
On February 7, 2003 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- JUD