+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (43)
On September 10, 2013 in the House:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/20 CHAPTER 53 SLA 13
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/21/13
On June 24, 2013 in the House:
- 11:51 AM 6/13/13 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/12/2013
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y7 N13
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 83(JUD)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): MICCICHE, DYSON, BISHOP, FAIRCLOUGH, GIESSEL
- PASSED Y20 N-
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: CSHB 83(JUD)
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- JUD RPT 2DP 1NR
- DP: COGHILL, DYSON
- NR: WIELECHOWSKI
- FN1: ZERO(LAW)
On March 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- JUD
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/13/2013
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 83(JUD)
- PASSED Y36 E3 A1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PRUITT NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y30 E4 A6
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): HUGHES, REINBOLD, LEDOUX, TUCK, PRUITT
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 83(JUD)
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GRUENBERG
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) NT 5DP
- DP: MILLETT, GRUENBERG, PRUITT, FOSTER, KELLER
- FN1: ZERO(LAW)
- COSPONSOR(S): MILLETT, LYNN, JOHNSON, HIGGINS, THOMPSON, GATTIS, ISAACSON,
- T.WILSON, OLSON, CHENAULT, AUSTERMAN
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): SADDLER
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): STOLTZE
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- JUD
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor