+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On May 8, 2024 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): D.JOHNSON
On April 19, 2023 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): TOMASZEWSKI
On March 27, 2023 in the House:
- RES RPT 5DP 3NR
- DP: MCCABE, SADDLER, WRIGHT, RAUSCHER, MCKAY
- NR: MEARS, ARMSTRONG, DIBERT
- FN1: (DNR)
- REFERRED TO FINANCE
On March 15, 2023 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): CRONK
On February 27, 2023 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- RES, FIN