+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (49)
On May 5, 2003 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/30/03
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/1 CHAPTER 14 SLA 03
On April 17, 2003 in the House:
- 10:20AM 4/17/03 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 14, 2003 in the Senate:
- SEEKINS, WAGONER, LINCOLN, FRENCH,
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/14/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 82(L&C)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): ELLIS, ELTON, DAVIS,
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- STEVENS G, DYSON, TAYLOR, OGAN, COWDERY
- BUNDE, WILKEN, OLSON, GREEN,
- STEVENS B, THERRIAULT
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: CSHB 82(L&C)
On April 7, 2003 in the Senate:
- FN3: ZERO(DPS)
- FN2: ZERO(LAW)
- DP: SEEKINS, ELLIS, THERRIAULT, OGAN
- JUD RPT 4DP
On March 17, 2003 in the Senate:
- FN3: ZERO(DPS)
- FN2: ZERO(LAW)
- SEEKINS, STEVENS G
- DP: BUNDE, DAVIS, FRENCH,
- L&C RPT 5DP
On March 4, 2003 in the Senate:
- L&C, JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 3, 2003 in the House:
- VERSION: CSHB 82(L&C)
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- COSPONSOR(S): HAWKER, GARA
- PASSED Y31 E8 V1
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 82(L&C)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- L&C CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/3/2003
On February 26, 2003 in the House:
- JUD RPT CS(L&C) NT 6DP
- DP: GARA, HOLM, ANDERSON, COGHILL,
- GRUENBERG, MCGUIRE
- FN2: ZERO(LAW)
- FN3: ZERO(DPS)
On February 24, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MCGUIRE
On February 14, 2003 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(LAW)
- DAHLSTROM, ROKEBERG, ANDERSON
- DP: LYNN, GATTO, CRAWFORD, GUTTENBERG,
- L&C RPT CS(L&C) NT 7DP
On February 12, 2003 in the House:
- CRAWFORD, GUTTENBERG, LYNN
- COSPONSOR(S): ANDERSON, DAHLSTROM,
On February 7, 2003 in the House:
- L&C, JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor