+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 6, 2001 in the House:
- REFERRED TO RESOURCES
- FN2: ZERO(DNR)
- FN1: ZERO(DNR)
- ROKEBERG
- DP: KOOKESH, COGHILL, MEYER, JAMES,
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) NT 5DP
On March 20, 2001 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): DYSON
On February 7, 2001 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MEYER
On January 22, 2001 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GREEN
On January 19, 2001 in the House:
- JUD, RES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor