+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 16, 2016 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): VAZQUEZ
- WITHDRAWN BY SPONSOR UC
On April 15, 2016 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): DRUMMOND, TUCK, OLSON
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/16 CALENDAR
- FIN CS ADOPTED UC
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO 1ST SUP CALENDAR 4/15/2016
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- FN4: ZERO(LWF)
- FN3: ZERO(H.FIN/CED)
- NR: PRUITT, WILSON, EDGMON
- DP: GUTTENBERG, GATTIS, MUNOZ, NEUMAN, THOMPSON
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) 5DP 3NR
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): SADDLER
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER L&C
- FN2: (CED)
- FN1: ZERO(LWF)
- DNP: COLVER
- DP: LEDOUX, TILTON, HUGHES, KITO, JOSEPHSON, OLSON
- L&C RPT CS(L&C) 6DP 1DNP
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): LEDOUX
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MILLETT, KITO
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GATTIS
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- L&C
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor