+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (37)
On April 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): THOMAS
On March 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- JUD RPT 2DP 2NR
- DP: COGHILL, WIELECHOWSKI
- NR: FRENCH, PASKVAN
- FN4: INDETERMINATE(LAW)
- FN5: ZERO(DPS)
- REFERRED TO FINANCE
On January 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): STEVENS, STEDMAN, COGHILL, OLSON, WAGONER, WIELECHOWSKI
On April 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- JUD, FIN
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): GIESSEL, DYSON, HUGGINS, MEYER, MENARD, MCGUIRE
On April 9, 2011 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 80
- PASSED Y33 N6 E1
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: HB 80
On April 8, 2011 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/8/2011
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/9 CALENDAR
- COSPONSOR(S): MILLETT, SADDLER
On April 5, 2011 in the House:
- FIN RPT 5DP 3NR
- DP: FAIRCLOUGH, T.WILSON, COSTELLO, STOLTZE, THOMAS
- NR: GUTTENBERG, JOULE, DOOGAN
- FN1: ZERO(DPS)
- FN3: INDETERMINATE(LAW)
- COSPONSOR(S): P.WILSON, DICK
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): JOHNSON
On February 14, 2011 in the House:
- JUD RPT 4DP 1DNP 1NR
- DP: KELLER, THOMPSON, LYNN, GATTO
- DNP: HOLMES
- NR: GRUENBERG
- FN1: ZERO(DPS)
- FN2: (LAW)
On February 11, 2011 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): THOMPSON
On February 9, 2011 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): CHENAULT, OLSON, KELLER, T.WILSON, STOLTZE
On January 18, 2011 in the House:
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/14/11
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- JUD, FIN
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor