+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (43)
On April 14, 1999 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 7/12/99
- SIGNED INTO LAW 4/13 CHAPTER 7 SLA 99
On March 31, 1999 in the House:
- 3:00 PM 3/30/99 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On March 29, 1999 in the House:
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y38 E2
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On March 26, 1999 in the Senate:
- PHILLIPS, ELTON, GREEN, PETE KELLY,
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RLS SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- TAYLOR, MILLER, LEMAN, LINCOLN,
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): HALFORD, TIM KELLY,
- DONLEY
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 80(RLS)
- PASSED Y18 N- E2
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
On March 24, 1999 in the Senate:
- HOUSE ZERO FISCAL NOTE (ADM)
- OTHER RECOMMENDATION: ELLIS
- DP: TIM KELLY, MILLER, LEMAN, PEARCE;
- RLS TO CAL SCS 3/26 4DP 1OR SAME TITLE
On March 16, 1999 in the Senate:
- RLS
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On March 15, 1999 in the House:
- STA CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/15/99
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED Y35 E5
- COSPONSOR(S): KEMPLEN, JAMES
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 80(STA)
On February 26, 1999 in the House:
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (ADM) 2/17/99
- WHITAKER, OGAN
- DP: JAMES, SMALLEY, KERTTULA, HUDSON,
- STA RPT CS(STA) 6DP
On February 24, 1999 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): HALCRO
On February 17, 1999 in the House:
- MLV RPT 7DP
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (ADM)
- DP: FOSTER, PHILLIPS, CROFT, COGHILL,
- KOTT, JAMES, MURKOWSKI
On February 8, 1999 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MURKOWSKI
On February 5, 1999 in the House:
- PHILLIPS
- COSPONSOR(S): COGHILL, ROKEBERG,
On February 3, 1999 in the House:
- MLV, STA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor