+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On April 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- REFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS
- STA, JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 11, 2011 in the House:
- VERSION: CSHB 8(FIN)
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- COSPONSOR(S): LYNN, JOHANSEN
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y29 N10 A1
- RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UC
- GARA NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y29 N11
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 8(FIN)
On April 9, 2011 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/9/2011
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/11 CALENDAR
- COSPONSOR(S): SADDLER, FEIGE, JOHNSON
On March 31, 2011 in the House:
- FN2: ZERO(LAW)
- AM: GUTTENBERG
- NR: GARA, JOULE, EDGMON
- DNP: DOOGAN
- DP: FAIRCLOUGH, T.WILSON, HAWKER, COSTELLO, STOLTZE, THOMAS
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 6DP 1DNP 3NR 1AM
On February 18, 2011 in the House:
- FN1: INDETERMINATE(LAW)
- DP: PRUITT, THOMPSON, KELLER, LYNN, GATTO
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) 5DP
On January 31, 2011 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): P.WILSON
On January 18, 2011 in the House:
- JUD, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/7/11